Williams v. Budnik

Plaintiff: Mark Antonio Williams
Defendant: C Budnik and F Washington
Case Number: 5:2016cv00086
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 66 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice. I certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment and the corresponding Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 01/20/2017. (rhm)
August 16, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 46 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as its findings in all respects; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing Defendant Washington without prejudice; certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith; and directing Plaintiff to stop filing discovery with the Court. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 08/16/2016. (rhm)
April 19, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 10 Partial Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition submitted by United States Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe; plaintiff's claims for money damages are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/19/16. (tjb)
April 5, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall prepare summons and the USM shall serve Defendants Budnik and Washington without prepayment of fees or costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/5/2016. (lej)
March 24, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that if Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's complaint, as it now stands, is deficient and may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/24/2016. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Budnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Antonio Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Budnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?