Anderson v. Simpson et al
Plaintiff: Theodore Anderson
Defendant: C Simpson, M Demery, Randy Watson and Marshall Reed
Case Number: 5:2016cv00091
Filed: March 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 JUDGMENT: Anderson's individual capacity claims against Simpson and Allen and his official capacity claims for damages are dismissed with prejudice. All other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/6/2017. (jak)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 47 Defendant Demery's motion for judgment on the pleadings and dismissing without prejudice claims against him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/28/2016. (mef)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 40 motion to amend; directing the Clerk of the Court to add "Jane Doe, the mail room lady" as a Defendant; and denying as premature 41 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/23/2016. (mef)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge Deere's recommendation, 28 , and overruling Anderson's objections 29 & 30 . Motion for partial summary judgment, 11 , granted. Anderson's official-capacity claims for money damages are dismissed with prejudice. His remaining claims against Watson and Reed are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/12/2016. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Simpson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Demery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?