West Wind Air LLC v. Thrush Aircraft Inc
Plaintiff: West Wind Air LLC and West Wind Air LLC a business doing business as Chrisair
Defendant: Thrush Aircraft Inc
3Rd Party Defendant: Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp, Woodward Inc, Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC and Estate of Donald Scott Brown
Case Number: 5:2016cv00274
Filed: August 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #154 Judgment. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include the text "Thrush's third-party claim against Pratt & Whitney Canada is dismissed without prejudice for a lack of personal jurisdiction" as marked on the document. (jak)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 JUDGMENT: Pratt & Whitney Canada Corporation's cross-claim against Woodward, Inc., and Thrush Aircraft, Inc.'s third-party claim are dismissed without prejudice for lack of personal jurisdiction. Thrush's third-party claim against the Estate of Donald Scott Brown is dismissed without prejudice for lack of personal jurisdiction. Thrush's third-party claim against Pratt & Whitney Canada is dismissed without prejudice for a lack of personal jurisdiction. All of West Wind Air LLC's claims against Thrush Aircraft are dismissed with prejudice based on these parties' settlement. Thrush's third-party claim against Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC is dismissed without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/25/2018. (jak)(Docket text modified on 9/26/2018 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: West Wind and Thrush have informally advised the Court that they've reached a settlement which is designed to resolve all claims between them and Thrush's hanging claim against Planesmart. Congratulations. The Third Amended Final Scheduling Order, No. #101 , is suspended, and the 5 November 2018 trial is canceled. All the pending motions, No. #116 , No. #120 , No. #122 , No. #124 , No. #126 , No. #128 & No. #141 , are denied without prejudice as moot. The Court will dismiss the case with prejudice after 14 September 2018 unless a party seeks some relief before then. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/15/2018. (slb)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #112 Pratt & Whitney's motion to dismiss. #132 Motion for summary judgment is denied as moot. #106 Motion is granted as modified. Service on Planesmart is quashed; Thrush must re-serve the company by 8/31/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/13/2018. (jak)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 REPLY to Response to Motion re #116 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Estate of Donald Scott Brown, Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC. (Goss, Patrick)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re #148 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #148 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 RESPONSE in Opposition re #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arthur Lee Coffman Condensed Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit Correspondence Between Counsel, #3 Exhibit Expert Report of James P. Peleck, #4 Exhibit PWC Report, #5 Exhibit Excerpts of Thrush's Maintenance Manual, #6 Exhibit Excerpts of PWC's Maintenance Manual)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #112 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. (Drennon, Baxter)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER denying #108 Motion. For the reasons stated in #45 at 2, the Court also denies Thursh's alternative request for leave to seek interlocutory review. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/7/2018. (jak)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re #143 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #143 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 RESPONSE in Opposition re #116 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report of James Peleck, #2 Exhibit Report of Pratt & Whitney Canada, #3 Exhibit Stan Clark Condensed Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit Arthur Lee Coffman Condensed Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit Aircraft Maintenance Records, #6 Exhibit David Trotter Condensed Deposition Transcript, #7 Exhibit Correspondence Between Y. Houde and D. Trotter, #8 Exhibit Yves Houde Condensed Deposition Transcript, #9 Exhibit Robert Duma Condensed Deposition Transcript, #10 Exhibit Excerpts of Thrush's Maintenance Manual, #11 Exhibit Plaintiff's Responses to Thrush's Requests for Admission, #12 Exhibit Excerpts of Pratt & Whitney Canada's Maintenance Manual, #13 Exhibit Unsigned Report of Steve Magginetti, #14 Exhibit Excerpts of Hartzell Propeller, Inc.'s Maintenance Manual)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #141 Motion to Strike filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION to Strike #138 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report of Steve Magginetti (Unsigned))(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #139 , granted. Reply due by 10 August 2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/31/2018. (slb)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp (Drennon, Baxter)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 SUBSTITUTED #118 STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by Estate of Donald Scott Brown, Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC. (Goss, Patrick) (Docket entry modified on 7/31/2018 to correct the linkage and the description of the document filed.)(thd).
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #138 Statement of Facts. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the linkage and the description of the document filed as "SUBSTITUTED #118 STATEMENT OF FACTS." (thd)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re #112 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpts of PWC's Website, #2 Exhibit Excerpts of United Technologies' Website, #3 Exhibit Information from the Arkansas Secretary of State's Website, #4 Exhibit Information Regarding P. Tremblay & D. Mathieu, #5 Exhibit LinkedIn Profiles of Two PWC Employees, #6 Exhibit Additional Excerpts from PWC's Website, #7 Exhibit Photo from AAAA 55th Annual Convention, #8 Exhibit Information Regarding PWC's Rebate Program)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STATUS REPORT of ChrisAir, Thrush, Pratt & Whitney Canada, and Planesmart by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RESPONSE in Opposition re #106 MOTION to Dismiss (Planesmart) filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Evidence of Receipt of Summons, #2 Exhibit Information from the Mississippi Secretary of State's Website)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re #132 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. (Drennon, Baxter)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #132 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. (Drennon, Baxter)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Drennon, Baxter)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion for summary judgment, No. #116 , noted. The Court requests the movants to file a substituted Local Rule 56.1 statement of undisputed facts, with citations to specific pages in the record for each stated fact, by 31 July 2018. No. #101 at 34. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/27/2018. (slb)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #128 Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,, filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re #128 Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,, filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Attachments: #1 Affidavit D. Stanley Logue (Supplement), #2 Exhibit Thrush Aircraft Bill of Sale, #3 Exhibit Expert Report of James P. Peleck, #4 Exhibit PWC Report, #5 Exhibit Arthur Lee Coffman Condensed Deposition Transcript, #6 Affidavit D. Stanley Logue (Initial), #7 Exhibit Plaintiff's Responses to Thrush's Requests for Admissions, #8 Exhibit Plaintiff's Aircraft Bill of Sale, #9 Affidavit Reagan Clark, #10 Exhibit Rusty JohnsonCondensed Deposition Transcript, #11 Exhibit Stan Clark Condensed Deposition Transcript, #12 Exhibit Kevin Jackson Condensed Deposition Transcript, #13 Exhibit MVP-50T Instructions for Continued Airworthiness, #14 Exhibit Expert Report of Thomas J. McCreary, #15 Exhibit Expert Report of Dr. Steven L. Morris and Dr. Robert C. Winn of ESI, #16 Exhibit Ron Roberts Condensed Deposition Transcript, #17 Exhibit Steve Krugler Condensed Deposition Transcript, #18 Exhibit Plaintiff's Responses to Thrush's Second Set of Discovery Requests, #19 Affidavit Joseph Bays, #20 Exhibit Excerpts of the Aircraft's Maintenance Records, #21 Exhibit David Trotter Condensed Deposition Transcript, #22 Exhibit FAA Memorandum Dated November 13, 2014, #23 Exhibit FAA Correspondence Dated November 21, 2014, #24 Exhibit Photo of Aircraft Cockpit's Reverse Warning, #25 Exhibit Excerpts of Thrush's Maintenance and Flight Manuals, #26 Exhibit Correspondence Between Y. Houde and D. Trotter Dated December 20, 2013, #27 Exhibit Excerpts of PWC's Maintenance Manual, #28 Exhibit Robert Duma Condensed Deposition Transcript)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #126 Motion for Order,,, of Declaration of Rights for Allocation of Fault (Renewed) filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION for Order of Declaration of Rights for Allocation of Fault (Renewed) by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of D. Stanley Logue, #2 Exhibit Aircraft Bill of Sale, #3 Exhibit PWC Report, #4 Exhibit Expert Report of James Peleck, #5 Exhibit Excerpts of Rusty Johnson's Deposition, #6 Exhibit Arthur Lee Coffman Report, #7 Exhibit Excerpts of Arthur Lee Coffman's Deposition, #8 Exhibit Excerpts of Thrush's Maintenance Manual, #9 Exhibit Excerpts of PWC's Maintenance Manual, #10 Exhibit Excerpts of N3000H Maintenance Records, #11 Exhibit Excerpts of Stan Clark's Deposition, #12 Exhibit Excerpts of David Trotter's Deposition)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #124 Motion in Limine, to Exclude Evidence of Other Incidents filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Other Incidents by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PWC Report, #2 Exhibit Excerpts of Arthur Lee Coffman's Deposition, #3 Exhibit Arthur Lee Coffman's Report)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #122 Motion in Limine,,,, to Exclude Sidney Lemoine's Rejected Safety Recommendation, Snow Engineering's Service Letter 172, and any Service Difficulty Reports filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Sidney Lemoine's Rejected Safety Recommendation, Snow Engineering's Service Letter 172, and any Service Difficulty Reports by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpts of FAA Order 8020.11C, #2 Exhibit Excerpts of David Trotter's Deposition, #3 Exhibit Lemoine Memo Dated March 12, 2014, #4 Exhibit FAA Correspondence Dated may 8, 2014, #5 Exhibit Lemoine Correspondence Dated May 14, 2014, #6 Exhibit FAA Memo Dated November 13, 2014, #7 Exhibit FAA Correspondence Dated November 21, 2014, #8 Exhibit Excerpts of Arthur Lee Coffman's Deposition, #9 Exhibit Excerpts of Stan Clark's Deposition, #10 Exhibit Excerpts of Rusty Johnson's Deposition, #11 Exhibit Excerpts of Steve Krugler's Deposition, #12 Exhibit Excerpts of Kevin Jackson's Deposition, #13 Exhibit Excerpts of Robert Duma's Deposition, #14 Exhibit Aircraft Maintenance Records)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #120 Motion in Limine, to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Arthur Lee Coffman Regarding Warnings on Daubert Grounds filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Arthur Lee Coffman Regarding Warnings on Daubert Grounds by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpts of Arthur Lee Coffman's Deposition, #2 Exhibit Arthur Lee Coffman's Report, #3 Exhibit Snow Engineering Service Letter 172, #4 Exhibit Aircraft Maintenance Records, #5 Exhibit Supplemental Case List to Arthur Lee Coffman's Report)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion to compel, No. #114 , denied without prejudice. Please follow the procedure outlined in the Third Amended Final Scheduling Order, No. #101 at 2, for any discovery disputes. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/20/2018. (slb)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re #116 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Estate of Donald Scott Brown, Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC. (Goss, Patrick)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #116 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Estate of Donald Scott Brown, Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC. (Goss, Patrick)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Estate of Donald Scott Brown, Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Goss, Patrick)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #114 Motion to Compel filed by Estate of Donald Scott Brown. (Goss, Patrick)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION to Compel by Estate of Donald Scott Brown (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Goss, Patrick)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #112 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. (Drennon, Baxter)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Drennon, Baxter)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #110 , granted. Response due by 30 July 2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/12/2018. (slb)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #106 MOTION to Dismiss , #107 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #108 Motion for Reconsideration in Light of Additional Authority filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION for Reconsideration re #36 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction in Light of Additional Authority by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #106 Motion to Dismiss filed by Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC. (Goss, Patrick)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION to Dismiss by Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Goss, Patrick)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #89 Motion to dismiss. Thrush's third-party claims against the estate are dismissed without prejudice. #95 request for ruling is held in abeyance. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/3/2018. (jak)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #102 , granted as modified. The parties may depose Coffman on a mutually convenient date sometime during the first two weeks in July. They may also take advantage of this extension to set more convenient dates for any remaining depositions. The rest of the deadlines in the Third Amended Final Scheduling Order, No. #101 , remain unchanged. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/19/2018. (thd)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE to Motion re #102 MOTION for Relief From Discovery Deadline to Conduct Deposition of Plaintiff's Expert, Arthur Lee Coffman filed by West Wind Air LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Awbrey, Nolan)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION for Relief From Discovery Deadline to Conduct Deposition of Plaintiff's Expert, Arthur Lee Coffman by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Bingham, M.)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 THIRD AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/5/2018 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 6/29/2018. Motions due by 7/30/2018. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 10/4/2018. Signed at the direction of the Court on 5/8/2018. (slb)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #99 , granted. Thrush's expert witness and opinions due by 16 May 2018. The Court also extends the Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendants' rebuttal expert deadline until 6 June 2018. A Third Amended Final Scheduling Order confirming the new deadlines will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/8/2018. (slb)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION to Extend Time to Identify Defendant's Expert Witnesses and Produce Opinions by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Bingham, M.)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion re #89 MOTION to Dismiss the Estate of Donald Scott Brown, Deceased,, #96 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Thrush's Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Estate of Donald Scott Brown. (Goss, Patrick)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #96 , granted. Reply due by 24 April 2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/17/2018. (slb)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Thrush's Response by Estate of Donald Scott Brown (Goss, Patrick)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Dismiss the Estate of Donald Scott Brown, Deceased, filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 SECOND AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/5/2018 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 6/29/2018. Motions due by 7/30/2018. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 10/4/2018. Signed at the direction of the Court on 4/3/2018. (slb)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: The parties have informally advised the Court that the motion, No. #92 , is unopposed. It is therefore granted. A Second Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/3/2018. (slb)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION to Amend/Correct #77 Scheduling Order, by Estate of Donald Scott Brown, Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC (Goss, Patrick)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Deficiency Letter notifying party that #89 Motion to Dismiss and #90 Brief in Support lack correct case number. (kbc)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #52 Third Party Complaint, #69 Answer to Third Party Complaint, #89 Motion to Dismiss the Estate of Donald Scott Brown, Deceased, filed by Estate of Donald Scott Brown. (Goss, Patrick) Additional attachment added on 3/20/2018: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss the Estate of Donald Scott Brown, Deceased, by Estate of Donald Scott Brown (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Goss, Patrick) Additional attachment added on 3/20/2018: #6 Main Document - Correct. (kbc)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #88 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include linkage to #80 First Amended Answer and Crossclaim as marked on the Order. (jak)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #72 and #81 Motions to dismiss. Thrush's #52 third-party claims against Woodward are dismissed without prejudice for want of personal jurisdiction. Pratt & Whitney's cross-claims against Woodward, #80 , are dismissed without prejudice for the same reason. The Court again declines to address prematurely whether there will be an apportionment among non-parties at any trial. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/7/2018. (jak)(Docket text modified on 3/8/2018 to correct the linkage)(jak)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER Joint status report, No. #86 , noted and appreciated. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/28/2018. (slb)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STATUS REPORT by All Parties Pursuant to ECF No. 77 by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 RESPONSE to Motion re #81 MOTION to Dismiss Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp's Cross-Claim filed by Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. (Drennon, Baxter)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #83 , granted. P&WC's response due by 5 January 2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/14/2017. (slb)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Woodward's Motion to Dismiss Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp.'s Cross Claim by Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp (Drennon, Baxter)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #81 Motion to Dismiss Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp.'s Cross-Claim filed by Woodward Inc. (Gaines, Gail)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp's Cross-Claim by Woodward Inc (Gaines, Gail)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #80 Answer and Crossclaim. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #52 Third Party Complaint, and CROSSCLAIM against THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT Woodard Inc by Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp" as marked on the document.(jak)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #52 Third Party Complaint, and CROSSCLAIM against THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT Woodard Inc by Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp.(Drennon, Baxter) (Docket text modified on 11/14/2017 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #78 , granted. Reply, No. 78-1, deemed filed. In the future, any movant may reply within seven calendar days after a response is filed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/9/2017. (slb)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Woodward Inc (Attachments: #1 Document Proposed Reply Brief)(Gaines, Gail)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial reset for 11/5/2018 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 6/29/2018. Motions due by 7/30/2018. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 10/4/2018. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/27/2017. (slb)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ANSWER to #52 Third Party Complaint, by Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp.(Drennon, Baxter)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re #72 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Woodward's Website, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of Woodward's Annual Statement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Woodward's Webpage Regarding Governor Control Systems, Inc., #4 Exhibit 4 - Map of Woodward's Full Service Distributors, #5 Exhibit 5 - Governor Control Systems, Inc.'s Webpage Regarding its Relationship with Woodward, #6 Exhibit 6 - Open Letter from Woodward Regarding its Relationship with Governor Control Systems, Inc., #7 Exhibit 7 - Woodward's Listing of its Global Business Partners and Locations)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
October 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT re #72 MOTION to Dismiss EX B by Woodward Inc. (Gaines, Gail)
October 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #72 Motion to Dismiss filed by Woodward Inc. (Gaines, Gail)
October 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION to Dismiss by Woodward Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX "A", #2 Exhibit EX "B")(Gaines, Gail)
October 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp served on 9/29/2017. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ANSWER to #52 Third Party Complaint, by Estate of Donald Scott Brown.(Goss, Patrick)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ANSWER to #52 Third Party Complaint, by Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC.(Goss, Patrick)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion to substitute, No. #67 , granted. Patrick J. Goss is substituted as counsel of record for Planesmart Aircraft Services, LLC and the Estate of Donald Scott Brown. Lindsey C. Meador is relieved as temporary counsel for these parties. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/2017. (slb)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Estate of Donald Scott Brown, Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC (Goss, Patrick)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Goss on behalf of Estate of Donald Scott Brown, Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC (Goss, Patrick)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #63 Motion for limited appearance pro hac vice. Meador must register with the CM/ECF for the Eastern District of Arkansas by 9/25/2017. When other counsel appears for Planesmart and the Brown Estate, Meador will be relieved. Other counsel must do so by 10/10/2017. #64 Motion for Extension of Time granted as modified. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion by Planesmart and the Brown Estate due by 10/10/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/19/2017. (mcz)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION (Unopposed) for Extension of Time in Which to File Responsive Pleading as to #52 Third Party Complaint filed by Estate of Donald Scott Brown and Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC. (alm)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Special or Limited Appearance (Pro Hac Vice) by Lindsey C Meador. Fee $100.00 receipt number LIT063725. Filed by Estate of Donald Scott Brown and Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC. (alm)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #61 , granted as modified. Final Scheduling Order, No. #23 , suspended. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue in due course. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/11/2017. (slb)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to Continue Expert Disclosure Deadline by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #58 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 10 October 2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/6/2017. (slb)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Hale on behalf of Woodward Inc (Hale, Michael)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION to Extend Time by Woodward Inc (Gaines, Gail)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Woodward Inc (Gaines, Gail)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Gail Ponder Gaines on behalf of Woodward Inc (Gaines, Gail)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. Estate of Donald Scott Brown served on 8/25/2017. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC served on 8/25/2017. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff West Wind Air, LLC, d/b/a ChrisAir's #1 Complaint by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Pratt & Whitney Canada Corporation, Woodward Inc, Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC, Donald Scott Brown Estate, filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc (third-party summonses issued and given to attorney for defendant Thrush Aircraft Inc for service upon third-party defendants) (jap)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #49 Motion to File a Third-Party Complaint. #46 Motion to amend answer is partly granted and partly denied. Please file clean copies of the amended answer and third-party complaint by 8/21/2017. Thrush's #50 status report is noted and appreciated. The addition of these new parties necessitates a continuance. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/14/2017. (jak)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to ECF No. 23 by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Third-Party Complaint)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ADDENDUM filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc to #46 Motion for Leave to File. Amended Answer and for a Declaration of Rights for Allocation of Fault (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #46 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer And For Declaration of Rights For Allocation of Fault filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying #39 Motion for Reconsideration. Thrush's alternative request for certification of the jurisdictional question for interlocutory review is denied. The #41 Motion to stay deadlines and for an amended final scheduling order is denied. The Court has extended the parties' deadline to request pleading amendments, No. 43 . With that change, the current scheduling order stands. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/7/2017. (jak)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION for Reconsideration re #36 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #37 Order, or Alternative Motion to Amend Order to Include Certification for Interlocutory Review filed by West Wind Air LLC. (Awbrey, Nolan)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #38 , granted as modified. Any party may move to amend its pleadings before 31 July 2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/26/2017. (slb)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #41 Motion to Stay All Deadlines and for Amended Final Scheduling Order filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and for Amended Final Scheduling Order by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence between A. Mehdizadegan and J. Thompson)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #39 Motion for Reconsideration, or Alternative Motion to Amend Order to Include Certification for Interlocutory Review filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Reconsideration re #36 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #37 Order, or Alternative Motion to Amend Order to Include Certification for Interlocutory Review by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bristol-Myers Squibb v. California, #2 Exhibit BNSF Ry. Co. v. Tyrell)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Add Parties by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: The Court made a mistake in its recent Order about personal jurisdiction over Thrush. The Court regrets its misstatement of the law about the record. Having recognized it, and reconsidered with that law correctly in mind, the Court stands by its conclusion: personal jurisdiction over Thrush in this case doesn't offend due process. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/16/2017. (jak)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying #24 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/14/2017. (jak)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying #26 and #29 Motions; and addressing #28 Joint report. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/30/2017. (ljb)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Attachments: #1 Document Appellee's Petition for Review - Lawson v. Simmons Sporting Goods, Inc.)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 MOTION to Deem Admitted filed by West Wind Air LLC. (Bridewell, Robert)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re #28 JOINT REPORT of Discovery Dispute filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. filed by West Wind Air LLC. (Bridewell, Robert)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by West Wind Air LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Reagan Clark, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of David Riddell)(Bridewell, Robert)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #29 Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ChrisAir's First Set of Discovery Requests, #2 Exhibit Good Faith Correspondence)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JOINT REPORT of Discovery Dispute filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #26 Motion to Deem Admitted filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Deem Admitted by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #24 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Attachments: #1 Affidavit D. Stanley Logue, #2 Exhibit Excerpts of S. Clark's Deposition, #3 Exhibit ChrisAir's Responses to Requests for Admissions, #4 Exhibit Aircraft Bill of Sale, #5 Exhibit Correspondence from D. Trotter to K. Jackson dated 1/27/14, #6 Exhibit Excerpts of D. Trotter's Deposition)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/5/2018 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 10/10/2017. Motions due by 11/7/2017. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 1/4/2018. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/29/2016. (slb)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Joint Report) (Bingham, M.)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PUBLIC NOTICE: Effective immediately the Pine Bluff Division will be an unstaffed office. Entered by the Clerk of the Court on 12/7/2016. (ljb)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/13/2017. Jury Trial set for 2/5/2018 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 11/30/2016. (slb)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Thrush Aircraft Inc.(Bingham, M.)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying without prejudice #10 Motion to Dismiss. Any renewed motion challenging personal jurisdiction after discovery is due by 3/1/2017. If Thrush doesn't move again on this point by then, personal jurisdiction will be conceded. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/14/2016. (jak)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Attachments: #1 Document Exhibit Index, #2 Affidavit of Joseph Kenneth ("Jody") Bays, #3 Affidavit of Eric Rojek, #4 Affidavit of D. Stanley Logue, #5 Affidavit of Christopher Lee Pollock, #6 Affidavit of Terry Humphrey)(Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #12 , granted. If he hasn't already done so, Fred C. Begy III must register with the CM/ECF for the Eastern District of Arkansas by 12 October 2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/6/2016. (slb)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ADDENDUM filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc to #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bingham, M.)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #13 Response to Motion lacks an attorney's email address and telephone number (General Order 53) and lacks a certificate showing service of the document (F.R.Cv.P. 5(d)(1)). (jak)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by West Wind Air LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stan Clark, #2 Affidavit of David Trotter, #3 Affidavit of Rusty Johnson)(Bridewell, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2016: #4 Main Document - Correct (submitted 10/6/2016)) (jak)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Fred C. Begy III. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-2924859. Filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Bingham, M.)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Thrush Aircraft Inc. (Bingham, M.)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Thrush Aircraft Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bingham, M.)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Abtin Mehdizadegan on behalf of Thrush Aircraft Inc (Mehdizadegan, Abtin)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Stephen Bingham on behalf of Thrush Aircraft Inc (Bingham, M.)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan E. Awbrey on behalf of West Wind Air LLC (Awbrey, Nolan)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Thompson, Jr on behalf of West Wind Air LLC (Thompson, James)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD. (Bridewell, Robert) (Docket text modified and payment canceled on 9/16/2016, pursuant to instructions from Chambers.) (thd).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD. (Bridewell, Robert) (Docket text modified and payment canceled on 9/16/2016, pursuant to instructions from Chambers.) (thd).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #4 and #5 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. CORRECTION: The docket text for each entry was modified to indicate the document was filed in error. (thd)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by West Wind Air LLC. Thrush Aircraft Inc served on 9/8/2016. (Bridewell, Robert) (Docket text modified on 9/13/2016 to correct the party served.) (thd).
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party served as follows: "Thrush Aircraft Inc served on 9/8/2016." (thd)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RECEIPT FILED: $ 400.00, receipt number LIT058220. (alm)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Thrush Aircraft Inc, filed by West Wind Air LLC ($400.00 Filing Fee received); summons issued and returned to attorney (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bkj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Wind Air LLC v. Thrush Aircraft Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrush Aircraft Inc
Represented By: Fred C. Begy, III
Represented By: M. Stephen Bingham
Represented By: Abtin Mehdizadegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Wind Air LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Wind Air LLC a business doing business as Chrisair
Represented By: Robert G. Bridewell
Represented By: James J. Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Nolan E. Awbrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Woodward Inc
Represented By: Gail Ponder Gaines
Represented By: Michael E. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Planesmart Aircraft Services LLC
Represented By: Patrick J. Goss
Represented By: Lindsey C. Meador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Estate of Donald Scott Brown
Represented By: Patrick J. Goss
Represented By: Lindsey C. Meador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?