Jones v. Kelley

Plaintiff: Charles Edward Jones, Sr
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2016cv00278
Filed: September 7, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 21 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff's 1 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/13/2016. (mcz)
November 15, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff's 1 Complaint is dismissed for failure to pay the filing fee. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/15/2016. (mcz)
September 28, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 4 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Permanent Injunction; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 09/28/2016. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Jones, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?