Smith et al v. General Motors Company et al

Plaintiff: Maeola Smith and Donnell Smith
Defendant: General Motors Company, Takata Corporation, TK Holdings Inc and Highland Industries Inc
Case Number: 5:2016cv00283
Filed: September 9, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court appreciates the Smiths' status report, No. 43 . To get the case moving forward, the Court orders the Smiths to file a motion for a Clerk's default and a default judgment by 10/31/2017. The Smiths must serve the motion on GM's registered agent in Arkansas by certified mail, and file proof of service by 11/17/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/12/2017. (jak)
September 29, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Smith's have not responded to the Court's August and September Order requesting more information to clarify service on the sole remaining defendant, General Motors, 40 & 41 . If the Smith's do not respond by 10/27/2017, the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/2017. (jak)
August 22, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court appreciates the status reports from the Smiths and Highland, 38 & 39 . Given the murky record on timely service, and the bankruptcy proceedings, the Court will dismiss Takata Corporation without prejudice unless the Smiths give reasons not to do so - with documentary support - by 8/31/2017. Status report on the GM services issues due by 8/31/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/22/2017. (jak)
April 26, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 24 Motion to dismiss is granted. TK Holdings, Inc., and Highland Industries, Inc., are dismissed without prejudice. 28 Motion to amend again granted with instructions and limitations. Third amended complaint due by 5/10/2017. 33 Amended Motion to strike denied without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/26/2017. (jak)
January 17, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for More Definite Statement. The 19 Motion to strike is denied without prejudice. A second amended complaint that clarifies all the issues highlighted in 15 and 16 is due by 1/31/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/17/2017. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. General Motors Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maeola Smith
Represented By: Alvin Leonard Simes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnell Smith
Represented By: Alvin Leonard Simes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takata Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TK Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?