Whitney v. Kelly et al
Plaintiff: James E Whitney
Defendant: Wendy Kelly, Swopes, Childress, Ryan, Clemmens and John Doe
Case Number: 5:2016cv00353
Filed: November 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 JUDGMENT: Consistent with 158 Order that was entered on this day and with this Court's prior Orders ( 99 , 102 , 106 , 146 ) it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/30/2018. (mef)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER adopting the 139 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety; granting Perkins' 124 motion for summary judgment on exhaustion; dismissing without prejudice Mr. Whitney's claims against defendant Perkins; denying Mr. Whitney's 144 motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis as incomplete; and directing the Clerk to resend Mr. Whitney a copy of the forms he needs to complete in order to appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/1/2017. (ljb)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Adopting 116 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Mr. Whitney's 97 Motion for ex parte injunctive relief, which the court construes as a motion for preliminary injunction, is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/31/2017. (mcz)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER adopting the 83 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety. W. Ryas' 74 motion for summary judgment is granted. Mr. Whitney's claims against Sergeant Ryas are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/30/2017. (jak)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER adopting the 4 Proposed Findings and Recommendations with one modification and dismissing separate defendant Wendy Kelley from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/27/2017. (mef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitney v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swopes
Represented By: Bourgon Burnelle Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Childress
Represented By: Bourgon Burnelle Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemmens
Represented By: Bourgon Burnelle Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?