Radford v. Brooks et al

Plaintiff: Tommy Radford
Defendant: Vivian Brooks, Erica Johnson, Cindella Wooten, Whitmore, Cynthia Gaines, Charlotte Sanders and Jared Byers
Case Number: 5:2017cv00116
Filed: April 20, 2017
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2018 68 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Based on 67 Order, this case is dismissed with prejudice - except for the claims specifically dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment and the corresponding Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/7/2018. (cmn)
August 30, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 42 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition, in all respects. The Clerk is to amend the docket to reflect the full and correct names of Defendants Shana Whitmore and Cyndella Wooten. ADC Defendants' 31 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. Plaintiff's claims against them are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. The Medical Defendants' 34 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted, and Plaintiff's claims against them are limited to the incidents raised in the 6 exhausted grievances. I certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/30/2017. (mcz)
August 4, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting the 30 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition; allowing Plaintiff to proceed on his claim of deliberate indifference regarding his blood pressure medication and monitoring against Defendants Brooks, Joh nson, Wooten, Whitmore, Sanders, Sail, and Mosely; dismissing without prejudice the excessive force claim against Defendant Sanders and his related medical care claim against Defendant Jack; dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's claims regard ing failure to treat mouth sores against Defendants Nunn, Montgomery, Burl, and Young; dismissing from this action without prejudice Defendants Gaines, Byers, Nunn, Montgomery, Burl, Young, and Jack; and certifying pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/4/2017. (mef)
May 17, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting the 5 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety; dismissing Defendant Griffin from this action without prejudice; allowing Plaintiff to proceed on his claims against Defendants Brooks, Johnson, Wooten, Whitmore, Gaines, Sanders, and Byers; and certifying, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/17/2017. (mef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radford v. Brooks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Brooks
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Johnson
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindella Wooten
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitmore
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?