Cooper v. Gray et al
Plaintiff: |
Shane Cooper |
Defendant: |
Michelle Gray, James, Charles Sanders, Wendy Kelley and Does |
Case Number: |
5:2017cv00117 |
Filed: |
April 24, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas |
Office: |
Pine Bluff Office |
County: |
Jefferson |
Presiding Judge: |
James M. Moody |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Thomas Ray |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 29, 2018 |
Filing
84
ORDER Adopting 83 Recommended Disposition. Officer Ashia James and Lieutenant Clifford Sims's 54 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted, and Mr. Cooper's claims against them are dismissed without prejudice. Ramona Huffs 57 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted, and Mr. Cooper's claims against her are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/29/2018. (mcz)
|
January 5, 2018 |
Filing
53
ORDER Adopting 49 Recommended Partial Disposition. Sims's 21 Amended Motion to Dismiss is denied; James's 36 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Cooper's request for injunctive relief against James is dism issed without prejudice. Huff's 27 Motion to Dismiss is denied in all respects. Defendants' Answers are due within 14 days of he entry of this Order. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal form this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/5/2018. (mcz)
|
August 17, 2017 |
Filing
8
ORDER Adopting 6 Recommended Partial Disposition. Cooper may proceed with his inadequate medical care claims against James, Sims and Does, and with his corrective inaction claim against Fuloon and Huff. Cooper's claims against all other defen dants are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for James, Sims, Fuloon and Huff. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint, and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/17/2017. (mcz)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?