Doering v. Kelley et al
Plaintiff: Alan Doering
Defendant: Wendy Kelley, Griffen, Correct Care Solutions, Jason Kelley, Stuckey, Powell and Heather Allen
Case Number: 5:2017cv00125
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Presiding Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JUDGMENT: Doering's chronic-care claim and his state law claims are dismissed without prejudice. All other claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/19/2018. (jak)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER partly adopting and partly declining the 50 Recommendation; partly sustaining the 51 Objection; and partly granting and partly denying the 43 Motion for partial summary judgment. Doering's chronic-care claim is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/9/2017. (ljb)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER adopting 41 Partial Recommendation. Doering's 40 Motion for Injunctive Relief is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/11/2017. (jak)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court vacates No. 3 , grants Doering's 1 IFP motion, and returns this case to the Magistrate Judge to handle payment details and screening. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/6/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doering v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Doering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuckey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?