Stricklin v. Molden et al

Plaintiff: Joshua Stricklin
Defendant: White, Raymond Molden and Richard
Case Number: 5:2018cv00236
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
0 Judge: Patricia S Harris
1 Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for the defendants and the United States Marshal to serve the #4 amended complaint and summons without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 11/15/2018. (ljb)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. A civil litigant does not have a constitutional or statutory right to appointed counsel in a civil action but the Court may appoint counsel at its discretion. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1). The Court has considered plaintiff's need for an attorney, the likelihood that plaintiff will benefit from assistance of counsel, the factual complexity of the case, the plaintiff's ability to investigate and present his case, and the complexity of the legal issues. In considering these factors, the Court finds that plaintiff's claims do not appear legally or factually complex, and it appears he is capable of prosecuting his claims without appointed counsel at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/12/2018. (cfd)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Joshua Stricklin. (cel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by Joshua Stricklin.(cel)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's institutional account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Cummins Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralization Bank Office, and the ADC Compliance Office; and directing Stricklin to file an amended complaint within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/20/2018. (ljb)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Joshua Stricklin. (ljb)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joshua Stricklin. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stricklin v. Molden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Stricklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Molden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?