Livingston et al v. Progressive Eldercare Service-Cleveland Inc
Plaintiff: Teressa Barnes and Janie Livingston
Defendant: Progressive Eldercare Service-Cleveland Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00044
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration filed by Progressive Eldercare Service-Cleveland Inc. (Kobbeman, Kerrilee)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/6/2019. (sjh)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by Progressive Eldercare Service-Cleveland Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reply)(Kobbeman, Kerrilee)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Walker, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration filed by All Plaintiffs. (Walker, John)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion #4 until 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/14/2019. (sjh)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time by Teressa Barnes, Janie Livingston (Walker, John)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Compel, Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration filed by Progressive Eldercare Service-Cleveland Inc. (Kobbeman, Kerrilee)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by Progressive Eldercare Service-Cleveland Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Livingston Acknowledgement, Agreement to Arbitrate, #2 Exhibit B - Barnes Acknowledgment, Agreement to Arbitrate, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Leslie Michelle Phillips)(Kobbeman, Kerrilee)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Progressive Eldercare Service-Cleveland Inc.(Kobbeman, Kerrilee)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Progressive Eldercare Service-Cleveland Inc filed by Janie Livingston, Teressa Barnes. (ljb)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Eldercare Service-Cleveland Inc from Jefferson County Circuit Court, Case Number 35CV-18-1172. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT070558. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Livingston et al v. Progressive Eldercare Service-Cleveland Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Eldercare Service-Cleveland Inc
Represented By: Kerrilee Elizabeth Kobbeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teressa Barnes
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janie Livingston
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?