Cowen v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Nita Cowen
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Corporation Service Company and Reid Robertson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00080
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Gibson, II on behalf of Nita Cowen (Gibson, Charles)
March 21, 2019 Filing 17 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/20/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/3/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 4/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 03/21/2019. (tmw)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party, #4 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Moore, John)
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party, #9 MOTION to Dismiss Party, #4 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Secretary of State Search)(Hartness, Sara)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying as moot #4 State Farm's motion to dismiss the defendant styled as "State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Agency". Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/7/2019. (ljb)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Moore, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Reid Robertson, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (cmn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Second Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint, and #3 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Reid Robertson, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(cmn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Reid Robertson. (cmn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss Party by Reid Robertson. (cmn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Nita Cowen against All Defendants.(cmn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Reid Robertson. (cmn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Reid Robertson. (cmn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (cmn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Party by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (cmn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Nita Cowen against All Defendants.(cmn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Nita Cowen against Reid Robertson, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(cmn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Lincoln County Circuit Court, case number 40CV-2019-9. Fee $400 receipt number LIT071040. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowen v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reid Robertson
Represented By: John E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nita Cowen
Represented By: Sara M. Hartness
Represented By: Charles S. Gibson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?