Welch v. Jacob et al
Plaintiff: Jeanette Welch
Defendant: Jacob Law Group PLLC, Michael A Jacob, II, Midland Credit Management Inc and Midland Funding LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00105
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Cases associated. Create association to 4:19-cv-00179-JM per #18 Order. (ljb)
May 8, 2019 Filing 19 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to #18 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 motion to consolidate. The Clerk is directed to reassign Welch v. Jacob, et al, 5:19-cv-105-BRW, and Brownlee v. Jacob, et al, 4:19-cv-208-BSM, to this Court. The cases will be consolidated with Campbell v. Jacob, et al., 4:19-cv-179 as the lead case. All filings should be made in the lead case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/8/2019. (ljb)
May 7, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Motion for Order Assigning Case as Related filed by Jeanette Welch. (McGaha, Corey)
May 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Order Assigning Case as Related by Jeanette Welch (McGaha, Corey)
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint - Class Action , filed by Jeanette Welch. Michael A Jacob, II served on 4/15/2019. (McGaha, Corey)
April 22, 2019 Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/1/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/15/2019. Jury Trial set for 4/21/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 4/22/19. (mmb)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Midland Credit Management Inc and Midland Funding LLC's answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Tuesday, May 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 04/22/19. (dmm)
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Jacob Law Group PLLC (Fletcher, Elizabeth)
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Michael A Jacob, II, Jacob Law Group PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Fletcher, Elizabeth)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Fletcher on behalf of Michael A Jacob, II, Jacob Law Group PLLC (Fletcher, Elizabeth)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Norris Shannon on behalf of Midland Credit Management Inc, Midland Funding LLC (Shannon, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Midland Credit Management Inc, Midland Funding LLC (Shannon, Michael)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint - Class Action , filed by Jeanette Welch. Midland Credit Management Inc served on 4/1/2019. (McGaha, Corey)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint - Class Action , filed by Jeanette Welch. Midland Funding LLC served on 4/1/2019. (McGaha, Corey)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint - Class Action , filed by Jeanette Welch. Jacob Law Group PLLC served on 4/1/2019. (McGaha, Corey)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 and #3 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Cathleen M. Combs and Daniel Edelman are admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/26/19. (mmb)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Daniel A Edelman. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3428948. Filed by Jeanette Welch (McGaha, Corey)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Cathleen M Combs. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3428937. Filed by Jeanette Welch (McGaha, Corey)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT-CLASS ACTION with Jury Demand against Michael A Jacob, II, Jacob Law Group PLLC, Midland Credit Management Inc, Midland Funding LLC filed by Jeanette Welch. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT071397.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch v. Jacob et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Welch
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Law Group PLLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Jacob, II
Represented By: Elizabeth Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Inc
Represented By: Michael Norris Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Represented By: Michael Norris Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?