Applewhite v. Dodson
Plaintiff: David Applewhite
Defendant: Dusty Dodson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00196
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Defendant Dodson's motion for the Court to allow him to file an answer to Mr. Applewhite's amended complaint beyond the time allowed under the rules of procedure. Defendant Dodson's #7 answer will be deemed timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/2/2019. (jbh)
August 1, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text. (jak)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Dusty Dodson.(Hays, Caroline)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Dusty Dodson (Hays, Caroline)(Docket text modified on 8/1/2019 to remove duplicate text)(jak)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Dusty Dodson served on 6/26/2019. (fjg)
June 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to Dusty Dodson. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summons for Defendant Dodson; and directing the USMS to serve a copy of #2 the Complaint, with any attachments, and a summons for Defendant Dodson without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/13/2019. (kdr)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's prison trust account, until the entire $350 filing fee has been paid; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Dallas County Detention Center and the appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/13/2019. (kdr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Dusty Dodson filed by David Applewhite. (llg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Applewhite. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Applewhite v. Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dusty Dodson
Represented By: Caroline V. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Applewhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?