Wesley v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lee A Wesley
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv00210
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee A Wesley. Social Security Administration served on 7/31/2019. (Giles, Greg)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date as 8/8/2019 as marked on the document. (jak)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/8/2019. (jbh)(Docket text modified on 8/12/2019 to correct the file date as 8/8/2019 as marked on the document) (jak)
July 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to Plaintiff's attorney for service. (kdr)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 07/23/2019. (glr)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER terminating #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 07/23/2019. (glr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Revised by Lee A Wesley (Giles, Greg)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an updated AO240 application; and directing Plaintiff to complete the application in its entirety and return it within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/27/2019. (kdr)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Lee A Wesley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lee A Wesley. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesley v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee A Wesley
Represented By: Greg R. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?