Xiong v. Golden
Plaintiff: Adam Xiong
Defendant: Darryl Golden
Case Number: 5:2019cv00217
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #16 Reply. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the linkage to #9 Answer. (jak)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to #9 Answer by Adam Xiong. (kdr)(Docket text modified on 8/27/2019 to correct the linkage) (jak)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #13 Motion to Take Deposition from Adam Xiong. At this time, discovery is stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/22/2019. (csf)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion to Take Deposition of Adam Xiong filed by Darryl Golden. (Strange, Sam)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Take Deposition from Adam Xiong by Darryl Golden (Strange, Sam)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Interrogatories by Adam Xiong. (llg)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: If Defendant intends to pursue a defense that Plaintiff failed to exhaust his administrative remedies before filing this lawsuit, it must be raised by motion for summary judgment no later than 9/13/2019. Discovery is stayed until further Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/14/2019. (csf)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (csf)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Darryl Golden.(Strange, Sam)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sam P. Strange, Jr on behalf of Darryl Golden (Strange, Sam)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Darryl Golden served on 7/15/2019. (fjg)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Mr. Xiong's motion to amend his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/19/2019. (ljb)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend and Add Defendant re #2 Complaint by Adam Xiong. (llg)
July 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to Darryl Golden. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare a summons for Defendant Golden; and directing USMS to serve a copy of #2 complaint, with any attachments and a summons for Defendant Golden without requiring prepayment of fees, costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/8/2019. (kdr)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account until the entire $350 filing fee has been paid; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Delta Regional Unit and the appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/8/2019. (kdr)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Darryl Golden filed by Adam Xiong. (llg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam Xiong. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xiong v. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Xiong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Golden
Represented By: Sam P. Strange, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?