Hughes v. Dutson et al
Plaintiff: Douglas L Hughes
Defendant: Stan McGee and Dusty Dutson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00219
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT: Hughes's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/16/2019. (ljb)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER withdrawing the reference; and dismissing without prejudice Hughes' complaint. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/16/2019. (ljb)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Plaintiff Hughes to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with an amended complaint within 30 days of the entry of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send to Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet and a 1983 complaint form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/3/2019. (kdr)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Douglas L Hughes.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Dutson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dusty Dutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas L Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?