Avery v. Dodson
Plaintiff: Akym Lamar Avery and Akym Lamaar Avery
Defendant: Dusty Dodson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00221
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Mail Returned. Mr. Avery is ordered to notify the Clerk of his current address within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/12/2019. (csf)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Akym Lamaar Avery re Notice of Docket Correction re #1 Motion and #2 Complaint. (fjg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Dusty Dodson.(Hays, Caroline)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Dusty Dodson served on 7/19/2019. (fjg)
July 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to Dusty Dodson and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Motion and #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the spelling of Plaintiff's name to Akym Lamaar Avery.(thd)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare a summons for Defendant Dodson; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the #2 Complaint, with any attachments, and a summons for Defendant Dodson without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/10/2019. (jbh)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Dallas County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/10/2019. (jbh)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Dusty Dodson filed by Akym Lamaar Avery. (ljb) (Docket text modified on 7/10/2019 to correct Plaintiff's name.)(thd).
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Akym Lamaar Avery. (ljb) (Docket text modified on 7/10/2019 to correct Plaintiff's name.)(thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avery v. Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dusty Dodson
Represented By: Caroline V. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akym Lamar Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akym Lamaar Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?