Raiford v. Kelley
Plaintiff: Montarris Raiford
Defendant: Wendy Kelley and Arkansas, State of
Case Number: 5:2019cv00245
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 Reply. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (missing pages) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #9 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to #8 Response to Habeas Petition by Montarris Raiford. (llg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2019: #1 Main Document) (jak).
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Wendy Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Sentencing Order, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Certified Copy of Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit A-3 - Guilty Plea Transcript, #5 Exhibit A-4 Clerk's Certificate, #6 Exhibit B - Plea Statement, #7 Exhibit C - Felony Information, #8 Exhibit D - Post Judgment Petition, #9 Exhibit E - Order Denying Post Judgment Petition)(Johnson, Jason)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/22/19. (kam)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Wendy Kelley (Johnson, Jason)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court to the parties. (lmc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M. Johnson on behalf of Wendy Kelley (Johnson, Jason)
August 2, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the linkage to #1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis as marked on the Order. (jak)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing the Clerk to serve a copy of #2 the petition and this Order on the Respondent and the Attorney General by regular mail; and directing the Respondent to file an answer, motion or other response to the petition within 21 days after service of this petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/1/2019. (kdr) (Docket text modified on 8/2/2019 to correct the linkage) (jak)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Montarris Raiford. (llg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Montarris Raiford. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raiford v. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: Jason M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montarris Raiford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?