Rochelle v. Faber and Brand LLC
Plaintiff: Jerry Rochelle
Defendant: Faber and Brand LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00255
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 motion for an extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint; and deeming #4 Faber and Brand, L.L.C.'s answer timely filed. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/4/2019. (jbh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Jerry Rochelle. Faber and Brand LLC served on 8/19/2019. (McGaha, Corey)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Jerry Rochelle. (McGaha, Corey)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 11/25/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/9/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/5/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 09/25/2019. (tmw)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Faber and Brand LLC.(Jackson, Joy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Faber and Brand LLC (Jackson, Joy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joy Nicole Jackson on behalf of Faber and Brand LLC (Jackson, Joy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION with Jury Demand against Faber and Brand LLC, filed by Jerry Rochelle. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073386.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rochelle v. Faber and Brand LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faber and Brand LLC
Represented By: Joy Nicole Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Rochelle
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?