Shelton v. Pine Bluff/Jefferson County Library
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn L Shelton
Defendant: Pine Bluff/Jefferson County Library
Case Number: 5:2019cv00256
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Cancellation of Depositions of Ricky Williams, Jeannie West, and Tina Blair by Gwendolyn L Shelton (jap)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Granting #5 Motion to amend. Shelton must file her amended complaint (attaching the EEOC papers) by 9/30/2019. Thereafter, the Clerk must issue summons and the U.S. Marshal must serve process without prepayment of fees. #3 Motion to appoint counsel denied. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/20/2019. (jak)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gwendolyn L Shelton.(kdr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Andrew Read on behalf of Pine Bluff/Jefferson County Library (Read, Nathan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #7 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. (jak)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT directing the Clerk's Office to issue a Notice of Reassignment. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/9/2019. (jbh)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Pine Bluff/Jefferson County Library.(Baker, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint filed by Gwendolyn L Shelton. (fjg)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER provisionally granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/8/2019. (jbh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gwendolyn L Shelton. (jbh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT UNDER TITLE VII OF THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT OF 1964 against Pine Bluff/Jefferson County Library, filed by Gwendolyn L Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gwendolyn L Shelton. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. Pine Bluff/Jefferson County Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn L Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pine Bluff/Jefferson County Library
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Read
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?