Perry v. WellPath et al
Plaintiff: Zeckeya Perry
Defendant: Claudia Harris, WellPath, Steven Stringfellow, Tony Melton, Major Day, Randy Watson and Tony McHan
Case Number: 5:2019cv00259
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that #6 ADC Defendants' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM be granted. Mr. Perry's claims against Defendants Watson, Harris and Day should be dismissed, with prejudice. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/3/2019. (csf)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT. (llg)
September 25, 2019 Summons Reissued as to Steven Stringfellow and WellPath. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER instructing the Clerk to prepare new summonses for Defendants Stringfellow and Wellpath; directing the USMS to serve each of these Defendants with a copy of #2 complaint, with any attachments, and a summons, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security; instructing Defendants Watson, Harris, and Day to provide Defendant Tony McHan's last-known address to the Court, under seal, within 14 days; and instructing the Clerk of Court to update the docket sheet to reflect the correct identity of Defendant McHan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/25/2019. (kdr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 8/26/2019 as to WellPath. (fjg)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 8/26/2019 as to Tony Melton. (fjg)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 8/26/2019 as to Steven Stringfellow. (fjg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Zeckeya Perry. (ljb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Major Day, Claudia Harris, Randy Watson. (Garner, Jerry)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Major Day, Claudia Harris, Randy Watson (Garner, Jerry)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry D. Garner on behalf of Major Day, Claudia Harris, Randy Watson (Garner, Jerry)
August 16, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for each Defendant; directing the Marshal to serve each Defendant with a copy of the #2 complaint, with any attachments, and a summons, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/15/2019. (jbh)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Maximum Security Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/14/2019. (jbh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Zeckeya Perry. (ljb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zeckeya Perry. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. WellPath et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Harris
Represented By: Jerry D. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WellPath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Stringfellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Day
Represented By: Jerry D. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Watson
Represented By: Jerry D. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony McHan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeckeya Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?