Fitzgerald v. US Steel Oilwell Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Katrina Fitzgerald
Defendant: US Steel Oilwell Services LLC and United Steelworkers International Union
Case Number: 5:2019cv00260
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant U.S. Steel Oilwell Services LLC. Plaintiff's 1981 and 1983 claims are dismissed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/3/2019. (ljb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by US Steel Oilwell Services LLC. (Keller, Thomas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by US Steel Oilwell Services LLC (Keller, Thomas)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by E. B. Chiles, IV on behalf of US Steel Oilwell Services LLC (Chiles, E.)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by US Steel Oilwell Services LLC.(Keller, Thomas)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Christoph Keller on behalf of US Steel Oilwell Services LLC (Keller, Thomas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Katrina Fitzgerald. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT073452.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzgerald v. US Steel Oilwell Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Fitzgerald
Represented By: Sheila F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Steel Oilwell Services LLC
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steelworkers International Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?