Muntaqim v. Kelley
Plaintiff: Malik Muntaqim
Defendant: Wendy Kelly and Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2019cv00262
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Patricia S Harris
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that #2 Muntaqim's complaint be dismissed without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/20/2019. (ljb)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #4 as moot Motion to Dismiss. Per Plaintiff's letter, (Doc. No. #5 ), Plaintiff withdraws his motion to dismiss. (Doc. No. #4 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/21/2019. (cfd)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to the Court filed by Malik Muntaqim. (ljb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Malik Muntaqim. (kdr)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk of Court to correct the style of the case to reflect the correct spelling of Defendant Wendy Kelley's name; denying without prejudice #1 IFP application; directing the Clerk of Court to enclose an IFP application along with a copy of this order; and directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application or pay the $400 filing and administrative fees within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/16/2019. (ljb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Wendy Kelly, filed by Malik Muntaqim.(kdr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Malik Muntaqim. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muntaqim v. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malik Muntaqim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?