Laquerre v. Arkansas Board of Correction et al
Plaintiff: Richard Laquerre
Defendant: Does 1-3, Internal Affairs, Unknown Medical or ADC Staff, Parole Board, Arkansas Board of Correction, Joe Page, Jeff Stevie, Steve Beaty, Linda Dykes, Melissa Moore, Chris Horan, Rory Griffin, Cooksey, Mena, Carol Chism, Hurst, Marshall Dale Reed, Onyia-Murphy, Wendy Kelly, Guy Henry, Floss, WellPath, Jada Lawrence, Rodney Ford and Laura E Ayers
Case Number: 5:2019cv00263
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #16 Declaration. CORRECTION: The original attachment was not added to the main document. The attachment was added to docket entry #16 Declaration pursuant to instruction from Chambers. (jak)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER approving and adopting in its entirety #7 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing without prejudice Arkansas Board of Correction, Wellpath, Reed, Stevie, Griffin, Floss, Dykes, Hurst, Ayers, Chism, Moore, Ford, Beaty, Cooksey, Mena, Kelly, Lawrence, and Does; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/20/2019. (ljb)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER approving and adopting in its entirety #10 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; denying #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification; denying Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/20/2019. (ljb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 Supplement to #11 Objection to #7 Report and Recommendations by Richard Laquerre. (llg)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Charles Brownell submitted by Charles Brownell for Richard Laquerre. (kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #1 Attachment to Declaration (Docketed Pursuant to Instruction from Chambers)) (jak).
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Richard Laquerre.(kdr)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel for the same reasons previously stated 5 #12 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/4/2019. (lej)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Richard Laquerre. (kdr)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations by Richard Laquerre. (kdr)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's motion for class certification be denied #9 . Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief be denied. The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/28/2019. (lej)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Certify Class by Richard Laquerre. (ljb)
August 27, 2019 Summons Issued as to Guy Henry, Chris Horan, Onyia-Murphy, Joe Page and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Clerk shall prepare summons and the USM shall serve Defendants Page, Henry, Horan, and Onyia-Murphy without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/27/2019. (lej)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Defendants Arkansas Board of Correction, Wellpath, Reed, Stevie, Griffin, Floss, Dykes, Hurst, Ayers, Chism, Moore, Ford, Beaty, Cooksey, Mena, Kelly, Lawrence, and Does be dismissed without prejudice. The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/27/2019. (lej)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Richard Laquerre.(kdr)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel #3 . A civil litigant does not have a constitutional or statutory right to appointed counsel in a civil action but the Court may appoint counsel at its discretion. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1). The Court has considered Plaintiff's need for an attorney, the likelihood that Plaintiff will benefit from assistance of counsel, the factual complexity of the case, the Plaintiff's ability to investigate and present the case, and the complexity of the legal issues. In considering these factors, the Court finds that Plaintiff's claims do not appear legally or factually complex, and it appears Plaintiff is capable of prosecuting these claims without appointed counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/16/2019. (lej)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #1 . If he so wishes, Plaintiff may complete a new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as an "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's failure to timely file an amended complaint may result in the dismissal of his claims pursuant to LR 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/16/2019. (lej)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Richard Laquerre. (kdr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Richard Laquerre.(kdr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Laquerre. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laquerre v. Arkansas Board of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-3, Internal Affairs, Unknown Medical or ADC Staff, Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Board of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Stevie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Beaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Dykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooksey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Chism
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Dale Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onyia-Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WellPath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jada Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura E Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Laquerre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?