Butler v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Plaintiff: Jonna Butler
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Jefferson Hospital Association Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00273
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 11 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the docket entry was filed in error (duplicate entry) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was previously filed as docket entry 10 .(jak)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (dmm)(Docket text modified on 10/7/2019 to indicate the document was filed in error) (jak)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston answer due 10/21/2019. Defendant shall have until and including 5:00 PM, October 21, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/7/19. (mmb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (Rademaekers, Iwana)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 ERISA SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 2/7/2020. Responses to any motions shall be filed on or before March 9, 2020. Entered at the direction of the Court on 9/11/19. (mmb)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 the unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston's answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Monday, October 7, 2019.The Joint Motion to Dismiss #6 Jefferson Hospital Association, Inc. is GRANTED. Accordingly, Jefferson Hospital Association, Inc is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 09/11/19. (dmm)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Jefferson Hospital Association, Inc. Without Prejudice by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (Rademaekers, Iwana)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (Rademaekers, Iwana)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Iwana Rademaekers on behalf of Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (Rademaekers, Iwana)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Jonna Butler. Jefferson Hospital Association Inc served on 8/26/2019. (Lacy, Brandon)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Jonna Butler. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 8/26/2019. (Lacy, Brandon)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jonna Butler. (Fee of $400. Receipt Number LIT073548. Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Hospital Association Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonna Butler
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?