Clark v. Simmons First National Corporation
Plaintiff: Carolyn Clark
Defendant: Simmons First National Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00284
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Deficiency Letter. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error. (kbc)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD. (jak) Docket entry modified on 10/24/2019 to indicate the document was filed in error. (kbc)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 and #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Matthew D. Miller and Carley A. Doyle are admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/23/19. (mmb)
October 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to Simmons First National Corporation and returned to counsel for service. (bmd)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Carley A. Doyle by Carolyn Clark. Fee of $100 received, Receipt number LIT074445. (bmd)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Matthew D. Miller filed by Carolyn Clark. Fee of $100 received, Receipt #LIT074444. (bmd)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Carolyn Clark of Filing of Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Swidler, Justin)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Justin L. Swidler is admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/6/19. (mmb)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Justin L. Swidler filed by Carolyn Clark. Fee of $100 paid, Receipt #LIT073778. (ljb)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 INDIVIDUAL, COLLECTIVE, AND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Simmons First National Corporation filed by Carolyn Clark. No summons issued. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT073777.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Simmons First National Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmons First National Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Clark
Represented By: Carley A. Doyle
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Matthew D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?