Skorcz v. Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Skorcz
Defendant: Bridgeway LLC, Universal Health Services Inc, UHS of Delaware Inc, Steven Kracht, Neely Robinson and Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00285
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/9/2019. Jury Trial set for 7/12/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1A before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/23/2019. (slb)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #7 & #13 Motions. All claims against Robinson (misnamed Robinson), Universal Health, UHS of Delaware, The Bridgeway, and Kracht are dismissed without prejudice. Quest's #9 Motion is partly granted and partly denied. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/18/2019. (jak)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or in the Alternative, Dismiss Defendants Robison, Universal Health Services, Inc. and UHS of Deleware, Inc. filed by Jacqueline Skorcz. (Swindoll, James)
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Steven Kracht. (Jung, David)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Steven Kracht (Jung, David)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Bridgeway LLC, Neely Robinson, UHS of Delaware Inc, Universal Health Services Inc (Herrington, Daniel)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc (Kim, Jane)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc. (Kim, Jane)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kim, Jane)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Bridgeway LLC, Neely Robinson, UHS of Delaware Inc, Universal Health Services Inc. (Herrington, Daniel)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or in the Alternative, Dismiss Defendants Robison, Universal Health Services, Inc. and UHS of Deleware, Inc. by Bridgeway LLC, Neely Robinson, UHS of Delaware Inc, Universal Health Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Neely "Robison" Kimbrell, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michelle Carson, #3 Exhibit 1 - Articles of Conversion)(Herrington, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #5 , granted. Ms. D. Faye Caldwell is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/11/2019. (slb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by D Faye Caldwell filed by Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc. Fee $100.00 received. Receipt #LIT073839. (fjg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Notice of Removal by Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc. (kdr)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT to Notice of Removal by Steven Kracht. (kdr)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jacqueline Skorcz.(kdr)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bridgeway LLC, Neely Robinson, UHS of Delaware Inc, Universal Health Services Inc from Grant County Circuit Court, Case Number 27CV-19-86. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073785 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skorcz v. Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgeway LLC
Represented By: Allison Christine Pearson
Represented By: Daniel Lee Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Health Services Inc
Represented By: Allison Christine Pearson
Represented By: Daniel Lee Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHS of Delaware Inc
Represented By: Allison Christine Pearson
Represented By: Daniel Lee Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Kracht
Represented By: David P. Glover
Represented By: David Chan Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neely Robinson
Represented By: Allison Christine Pearson
Represented By: Daniel Lee Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories Inc
Represented By: D. Faye Caldwell
Represented By: Jane A. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Skorcz
Represented By: James F. Swindoll
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?