Wilcox v. Drew County Sheriff Department et al
Plaintiff: Robert Scott Wilcox
Defendant: Drew County Circuit Court and Drew County Sheriff Department
Case Number: 5:2019cv00288
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT: Wilcox's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/18/2019. (jak)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to reopen. Wilcox's claims are Heck-barred. Heck v. Humphrey, 512 U.S. 477, 486-87 (1994); Newmy v. Johnson, 758 F.3d 1008 (8th Cir. 2014). Wilcox's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. This dismissal counts as a "strike". An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/8/2019. (jak)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Reopen Case by Robert Scott Wilcox. (ljb)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's prison trust account and forwarded to the Clerk of Court until the $350 filing fee is paid in full; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to Administrator of the Drew County Detention Center; staying the case ; and directing Wilcox to file any motion to reopen his case within 60 days of the final disposition of his state case, by 9/16/2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/16/2019. (kdr)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Robert Scott Wilcox. (ljb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Scott Wilcox. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilcox v. Drew County Sheriff Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew County Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Scott Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?