Dennis v. Schell & Kampeter Inc
Plaintiff: Edward Dennis
Defendant: Schell & Kampeter Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00296
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K. O'Toole on behalf of Schell & Kampeter Inc (O'Toole, Daniel)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly Jeremy M. Brenner is admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/16/19. (mmb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Schell & Kampeter Inc (Keller, Thomas)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jeremy M. Brenner. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3559567. Filed by Schell & Kampeter Inc (Keller, Thomas)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by E. B. Chiles, IV on behalf of Schell & Kampeter Inc (Chiles, E.)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/23/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/6/2020. Bench Trial set for 10/13/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 10/15/19. (mmb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Schell & Kampeter Inc.(Keller, Thomas)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Christoph Keller on behalf of Schell & Kampeter Inc (Keller, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Dennis. Schell & Kampeter Inc served on 9/24/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT - COLLECTIVE ACTION against Schell & Kampeter Inc filed by Edward Dennis. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT073913.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis v. Schell & Kampeter Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Dennis
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schell & Kampeter Inc
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: Jeremy M. Brenner
Represented By: Daniel K. O'Toole
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?