Granite Re Inc v. Kabec LLC et al
Plaintiff: Granite Re Inc
Defendant: Billy Pearson, Kabec LLC, Rebecca Pearson and Kabec LLC doing business as Kabec LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00329
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/20/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/4/2020; and Bench Trial set for 10/26/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/13/2019. (hml)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to instructions from the Court, this case is transferred to the docket of Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/18/2019. (jak)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Kabec LLC (Keech, Kevin)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kabec LLC, Billy Pearson, Rebecca Pearson.(Keech, Kevin)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Granite Re Inc (Grace, David)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Granite Re Inc. Rebecca Pearson served on 10/19/2019. (Grace, David)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Granite Re Inc. Billy Pearson served on 10/19/2019. (Grace, David)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Granite Re Inc. Kabec LLC served on 10/19/2019. (Grace, David)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Granite Re Inc. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT074405.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granite Re Inc v. Kabec LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Pearson
Represented By: Kevin P. Keech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kabec LLC
Represented By: Kevin P. Keech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Pearson
Represented By: Kevin P. Keech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kabec LLC doing business as Kabec LLC
Represented By: Kevin P. Keech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granite Re Inc
Represented By: David A. Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?