Cloird v. Payne
Plaintiff: Gary Cloird and Saba K Makkali
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Case Number: 5:2019cv00356
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending #5 Respondent Dexter Payne's Motion to Dismiss be granted; recommending the #2 Petition for Habeas Relief be dismissed without prejudice; and recommending a Certificate of Appealability be denied. Objections due within 14 days of the entry of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/6/2020. (jbh)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Mr. Cloird to file, on or before 1/3/2020, a Response addressing Petitioner's argument for dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/11/2019. (jbh)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Dexter Payne (Johnson, Jason)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M. Johnson on behalf of Dexter Payne (Johnson, Jason)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Petitioner Cloird's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing the Clerk of Court to serve a copy of #2 2254 Petition and this Order, on Respondent and the Attorney General by mail; and directing Respondent to file a responsive pleading within 21 days of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/18/2019. (kdr)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gary Cloird. (ljb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gary Cloird. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cloird v. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Cloird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saba K Makkali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Represented By: Jason M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?