Seven Rivers Leasing Corporation, Inc.
Debtor: Seven Rivers Leasing Corporation, Inc.
Us Trustee: U.S. Trustee (ust)
Case Number: 2:2024bk70617
Filed: April 16, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Bianca M Rucker
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2024 Filing 22 BNC Certificate of Mailing(RE: related document(s) #20 Order Setting Claims Bar Date (Related Doc #12) Proofs of Claims due by 6/21/2024. Entered on Docket 6/7/2024 (Jones, Michelle) ) No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 06/09/2024. (Admin.)
June 9, 2024 Filing 21 BNC Certificate of Mailing(RE: related document(s) #19 Order to Submit Order(RE: related document(s) #12 Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by Donald A. Brady Jr. on behalf of Seven Rivers Leasing Corporation, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Matrix)) Entered on 6/7/2024 (Jones, Michelle)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/09/2024. (Admin.)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Setting Claims Bar Date (Related Doc #12) Proofs of Claims due by 6/21/2024. Entered on Docket 6/7/2024 (Jones, Michelle)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order to Submit Order(RE: related document(s) #12 Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by Donald A. Brady Jr. on behalf of Seven Rivers Leasing Corporation, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Matrix)) Entered on 6/7/2024 (Jones, Michelle)
May 26, 2024 Filing 18 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing(RE: related document(s) #16 Hearing SCHEDULED(RE: related document(s) #15 Motion to Dismiss or Convert Case Filed by U.S. Trustee) Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2024 at 09:00 AM at Fort Smith Division.) No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 05/26/2024. (Admin.)
May 24, 2024 Filing 17 BNC Certificate of Mailing(RE: related document(s) #14 Meeting of Creditors Continued with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/26/2024 at 01:30 PM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors.) No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 05/24/2024. (Admin.)
May 24, 2024 Filing 16 Hearing SCHEDULED(RE: related document(s) #15 Motion to Dismiss or Convert Case Filed by U.S. Trustee) Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2024 at 09:00 AM at Fort Smith Division. (Carter, Angie)
May 23, 2024 Filing 15 Motion to Dismiss or Convert Case Filed by U.S. Trustee (Sherman, Shari)
May 22, 2024 Filing 14 Meeting of Creditors Continued with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/26/2024 at 01:30 PM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors. (Sherman, Shari)
May 20, 2024 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Patrick McDaniel Creditor Mena Airport Commission. (McDaniel, Patrick)
May 8, 2024 Filing 12 Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by Donald A. Brady Jr. on behalf of Seven Rivers Leasing Corporation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Matrix) (Brady, Donald)
April 30, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Lance R. Miller Interested Party First Financial Bank (Miller, Lance)
April 22, 2024 Filing 10 Request by Ally Bank Designating Mailing Address for Notices pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002(g)(1), requesting service of copies of all future notices at the address specified in the process of filing this Request Filed by (Sharma, Amitkumar)
April 19, 2024 Filing 9 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors(RE: related document(s) #5 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors. Last day to oppose dischargeability is 7/22/2024. (Mansfield, MaryBeth) Modified on 4/17/2024 .) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 04/19/2024. (Admin.)
April 18, 2024 Filing 8 BNC Certificate of Mailing(RE: related document(s) #6 Order Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc #4) Entered on Docket 4/16/2024 (Jones, Michelle) ) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.)
April 17, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice to Receive all Notices and Papers Filed by James Paul Beachboard Interested Party First Financial Bank (Beachboard, James)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc #4) Entered on Docket 4/16/2024 (Jones, Michelle)
April 16, 2024 Filing 5 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors. Last day to oppose dischargeability is 7/22/2024. (Mansfield, MaryBeth) Modified on 4/17/2024 (Jones, Michelle).
April 16, 2024 Filing 4 Application to Employ Attorney for Debtor Filed by Donald A. Brady Jr. on behalf of Seven Rivers Leasing Corporation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Brady, Donald)
April 16, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Resolution Filed by Donald A. Brady Jr. on behalf of Debtor Seven Rivers Leasing Corporation, Inc. (Brady, Donald)
April 16, 2024 Filing 2 RECEIPT of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 2:24-bk-70617) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. receipt number A8514807, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
April 16, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Seven Rivers Leasing Corporation, Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/14/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 08/14/2024. (Brady, Donald)

Search for this case: Seven Rivers Leasing Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Seven Rivers Leasing Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Donald A. Brady, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. Trustee (ust)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?