Terminix Intl Co LP, et al v. Crisel, et al

Case Number: 1:2005cv01065
Filed: July 29, 2005
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Loan
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 68 Motion to Dismiss. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 14, 2014. (mll)
January 29, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER case is terminated and removed from the court's trial docket upon completion of discovery in the state court case; case may be reopened upon notification by the parties. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on January 28, 2010. (cnn) Modified on 2/1/2010 to correct typo (cnn).
November 3, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Set Aside Order and 27 Motion for Reconsideration of Order; stay of the Union County action Crisel v. Terminix is lifted. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on November 3, 2008. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terminix Intl Co LP, et al v. Crisel, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?