Modica v. Paper, Allied-Industrial, Chemical and Energy Workers Intl Union et al

Case Number: 1:2005cv01087
Filed: September 26, 2005
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Labor: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT (to correct clerical error). Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on January 6, 2011. (cnn)
January 5, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT/ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 76 and granting 50 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Paper, Allied-Industrial, Chemical and Energy Workers Intl Union, case dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on January 5, 2011. (cnn)
December 3, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paper, Allied-Industrial, Chemical and Energy Workers Intl Union; Objections to R&R due by 12/20/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 3, 2010. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modica v. Paper, Allied-Industrial, Chemical and Energy Workers Intl Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?