Lee v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 1:2006cv01056
Filed: June 1, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
Presiding Judge: Bobby E. Shepherd
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2006 8 JUDGMENT REMANDING CASE TO SSA pursuant to "sentence six" of 42:405(g) . Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on August 21, 2006. (cc: OHA)(cnn)
August 22, 2006 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on August 21, 2006. (cnn)
August 2, 2006 6 MOTION to Remand by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
June 29, 2006 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bobby E. Shepherd. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on 6/29/06. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Consent# 2 Exhibit B - Government's Consent)(cap)
June 21, 2006 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Yvette Lee. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 6/6/2006, answer due 8/7/2006. (Thornton, Denver)
June 1, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (cnn)
June 1, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on June 1, 2006. (cnn)
June 1, 2006 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Yvette Lee. (cnn)
June 1, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Yvette Lee.(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?