Jacobs v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 1:2006cv01076
Filed: July 26, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2007 17 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees: Fees awarded to Mary Thomas in the amount of $1926.55 against SSA Commissioner; granting Motion 14 for attorney fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Tabatha A Jacobs. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on September 6, 2007. (cnn)
August 28, 2007 16 RESPONSE to Motion re 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
August 17, 2007 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Tabatha A Jacobs. (Thomason, Mary)
August 17, 2007 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Tabatha A Jacobs. (Thomason, Mary)
June 29, 2007 13 JUDGMENT - Case reversed and remanded pursuant to "sentence four" of 42:405(g). Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on June 28, 2007. (cc: OHA)(cnn)
June 29, 2007 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on June 28, 2007. (cnn)
February 21, 2007 ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant. Judge Bobby E. Shepherd no longer assigned to the case. (cnn)
December 15, 2006 11 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
November 15, 2006 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Tabatha A Jacobs. (Thomason, Mary)
November 1, 2006 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has up to and including November 15, 2006 to file her Brief in Support of Appeal. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on November 1, 2006. (jdc)
October 31, 2006 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Tabatha A Jacobs. (Thomason, Mary)
October 26, 2006 8 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on October 26, 2006. (rwg)
October 26, 2006 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief.(rwg)
October 2, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/1/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/1/2006. (rwg)
September 29, 2006 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Webb, Mark)
August 23, 2006 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bobby E. Shepherd. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on August 23, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Consent# 2 Exhibit Commissioner's Consent)(bak)
August 10, 2006 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Tabatha A Jacobs. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 8/1/2006, answer due 10/2/2006. (Thomason, Mary)
July 26, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (cnn)
July 26, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on July 24, 2006. (cnn)
July 26, 2006 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tabatha A Jacobs. (cnn)
July 26, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Tabatha A Jacobs.(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?