Phillips v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 1:2006cv01077
Filed: July 26, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2006 10 Featured Case ORDER granting plaintiff's 9 motion to dismiss is granted; complaint dismissed. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on November 27, 2006. (cnn)
November 27, 2006 TEXT ENTRY ONLY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge Harry F. Barnes. Judge Bobby E. Shepherd no longer assigned to the case. (cnn)
October 30, 2006 9 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Brenda B Phillips. (Thornton, Denver)
October 26, 2006 8 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on October 26, 2006. (rwg)
October 26, 2006 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (rwg)
October 2, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/1/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/1/2006. (rwg)
September 28, 2006 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Webb, Mark)
September 12, 2006 ***CORRECTED ENTRY *** NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED Service of Complaint on Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 8/3/06, answer due 10/2/2006. (cnn)
September 12, 2006 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Brenda B Phillips. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 8/3/2006. (Thornton, Denver) Modified on 9/13/2006 - answer date correction(cnn).
August 24, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bobby E. Shepherd. Signed by Judge Harry F. Barnes on August 24, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Consent# 2 Exhibit Commissioner's Consent)(bak)
July 26, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (cnn)
July 26, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on June 24, 2006. (cnn)
July 26, 2006 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brenda B Phillips. (cnn)
July 26, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Brenda B Phillips.(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?