Hicks v. Norwood et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv01086
Filed: September 20, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 80 ; claims dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on September 2, 2010. (cnn)
September 18, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 67 ; granting and denying in parts 29 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by - Baker, David Norwood, Gregory Unknown; official capacity claims dismissed. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on September 18, 2009. (cnn)
August 11, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defendants, to be granted and denied in parts; Objections to R&R due by 8/28/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 11, 2009. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Norwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?