Walls v. Sagamore Ins

Plaintiff: Margie Walls
Defendant: Sagamore Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2007cv01020
Filed: March 8, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2012 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 13, 2012. (lw)
November 29, 2012 131 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL APPROVAL ORDER - Class Settlement Agreement; plaintiffs' counsel awarded attorney fess and costs; directions for payment to class and class representatives; upon written notification to class counsel of delivery of settlement fund, counsel will present court with an order of dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 29, 2012. (cnn)
March 15, 2011 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 114 granting and denying in parts 88 Motion to Certify Class filed by Margie Walls, Beatrice Eaton, Court finds that Plaintiff Margie Walls cannot serve as a class representative. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 15, 2011. (cnn)
March 31, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 31, 2009. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walls v. Sagamore Ins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie Walls
Represented By: David S. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagamore Insurance Company
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?