Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Chemtura Corporation

Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Chemtura Corporation
Intervenor Plaintiff: Cecil Nicholas Delphin and Robert Bennett
Intervenor Defendant: R. L. Johnson & Son, Inc. and Chemtura Corporation
Case Number: 1:2007cv01025
Filed: March 29, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 28:451 Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion for Summary Judgment; plaintiffs claims dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on July 6, 2009. (cnn)
March 26, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE as to EEOC; individual claims of intervenors not reopened at this time re: automatic stay under Bankruptcy. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 26, 2009. (cnn)
March 25, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 70 Suggestion of Bankruptcy filed by Chemtura Corporation; case adminstratively terminated. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 25, 2009. (cnn)
January 9, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 46 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Chemtura Corporation; dismisses with prejudice the causes of action contained in Count IV of the Complaint in Intervention on Behalf of Cecil Nicholas Delphin and Robert Bennett (Doc. 7) and Count IV of the Complaint in Intervention on Behalf of Murphy Chambliss and Victor Moody (Doc. 18). Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on January 8, 2009. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Chemtura Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Terry L Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemtura Corporation
Represented By: James Matthew Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Cecil Nicholas Delphin
Represented By: Pamela D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Robert Bennett
Represented By: Pamela D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: R. L. Johnson & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Floyd Mattison Thomas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Chemtura Corporation
Represented By: James Matthew Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?