Williams v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Beverly D Williams
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 1:2008cv01018
Filed: March 26, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Bradley
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 34 ; granting 29 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $14,295.25 EAJA Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 7, 2013. (cnn)
June 19, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: granting 24 Motion for Attorney Fees and adopting 27 Report and Recommendations in the amount of $7522.65 under EAJA. This amount should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 18, 2012. (cnn)
March 2, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT adopting the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge in toto as set forth in the 22 Report and Recommendations. Further the Court hereby reverses the Commissioner's decision and directs an immediate award of disability benefits. Plaintiff's past-due benefits shall be calculated from her alleged onset date of 3/9/11. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 1, 2012. (lw)
April 7, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 7, 2011. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly D Williams
Represented By: David Roscoe Trussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?