USA v. FJN Contractors, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: FJN Contractors, Inc., Francisco Garcia Julian, Linda Marlene-Julian Gorz, Deborah Julian, International Paper Company, Ford Motor Credit Company, AGWorks, Inc. and Dan Bremer
Case Number: 1:2008cv01065
Filed: August 6, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: Bradley
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 28:1345 Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION directing US Marshal to transfer sale proceeds of $90,307.28 to US, Department of Agriculture, Farm Service Agency and $1,5080.02 to USMS (certified copy to USMS). Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on December 6, 2010. (cnn)
December 1, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT in favor of USA against Francisco Garcia Julian in the amount of $124,267.47 with court costs in the amount of $1,296.75 and interest at the rate of.39% per annum until paid; granting 58 MOTION for Deficiency Judgment Against Separate Defendant, Francisco Garcia Julian filed by USA. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on December 1, 2010. (cnn)
April 19, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion to proceed with foreclosure sale. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on April 19, 2010. (cnn)
October 9, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court DECREE of Foreclosure in rem against the property and in personam against the defendant Francisco Garcia Julian, Individually and as partner to FJN Contractors, Inc. in amount of 207,480.35; interest from date of judgment to accrue at rate of.39; if judgment not paid within ten days, setting forth terms and conditions for judicial sale. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on October 7, 2009. (cnn)
September 30, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: granting 24 motion for summary judgment; in favor of USA against FJN Contractors, Inc., Francisco Garcia Julian, Linda Marlene-Julian Gorz in the amount of $207,480.35. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on September 30, 2009. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. FJN Contractors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Mark W. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FJN Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Garcia Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Marlene-Julian Gorz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGWorks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Bremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?