Hicks v. Lucas et al

Plaintiff: Anthony - Hicks
Defendant: Paul Lucas, Joe Strickland, David Norwood, Chris Gill, Mark Speer and David W Talley, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2008cv01089
Filed: December 3, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Ouachita
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Motion for Reconsideration re 63 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations filed by Anthony - Hicks. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 16, 2012. (cnn)
May 31, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT/ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 62 ; plaintiff's claims dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 31, 2012. (cnn)
March 14, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 32 ; granting and denying in parts 22 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Chris Gill, David Norwood, Mark Speer, Joe Strickland, Paul Lucas. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 14, 2011. (cnn)
October 5, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 7 ; separate defendant, David W Talley, Jr terminated. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on October 5, 2009. (cnn)
September 8, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Anthony - Hicks; Objections to R&R due by 9/25/2009; David Talley should not be named as a defendant in this suit. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 8, 2009. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Lucas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony - Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W Talley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?