Tidwell v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Trista Tidwell
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 1:2009cv01001
Filed: January 6, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Ouachita
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; 19 granting in part 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Trista Tidwell in the amount of $6358.48. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on June 2, 2010. (cnn)
February 23, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 14 ; case reversed and remanded pursuant to 42:405(g) with direction to further develop the record. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on February 23, 2010. (cnn)
February 5, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Trista Tidwell; Objections to R&R due by 2/22/2010. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on February 5, 2010. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tidwell v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trista Tidwell
Represented By: David Roscoe Trussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?