Daniels v. DeLassuss

Plaintiff: Rodney Daniels
Defendant: Roy DeLassuss
Case Number: 1:2009cv01002
Filed: January 7, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; 10 case dismissed for failure to prosecute and obey court order. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on July 6, 2009. (cnn)
June 8, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Complaint filed by Rodney Daniels; Objections to R&R due by 6/25/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 8, 2009. (cnn)
January 7, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER transferring case to the Western District of Arkansas and directing the Clerk to immediately transfer a copy of this order and the original file to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/7/09. (bkp) [Transferred from ared on 1/7/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. DeLassuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy DeLassuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?