Wallace v. Google Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Jason Duffy Wallace
Defendant: Google Inc., CS Enterprises and Farmers Bank of Hamburg, Arkansas
Case Number: 1:2010cv01009
Filed: January 28, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Ashley
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2010 8 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto. Further, the case should be and hereby is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on April 23, 2010. (lw)
March 31, 2010 7 Featured Case ORDER denying 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 31, 2010. (cnn)
March 31, 2010 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint and 4 Amended Complaint filed by Jason Duffy Wallace; Objections to R&R due by 4/19/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 31, 2010. (cnn)
March 2, 2010 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jason Duffy Wallace. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(cnn)
February 12, 2010 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to 1 Complaint against Farmers Bank of Hamburg, Arkansas, CS Enterprises, Google Inc., filed by Jason Duffy Wallace. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Jason Duffy Wallace.(cnn)
January 28, 2010 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; plaintiff directed to file amended complaint as specified by 2/18/10. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 28, 2010. (cnn)
January 28, 2010 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and MOTION for Service by Jason Duffy Wallace. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(cnn)
January 28, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against CS Enterprises, Farmers Bank of Hamburg, Arkansas, Google Inc., filed by Jason Duffy Wallace.(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Google Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Duffy Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CS Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Bank of Hamburg, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?