Richardson v. Jones et al

Plaintiff: Gary Donnell Richardson
Defendant: Ken Jones, Clark Burton, Lt. Bass, Jim Sanders and Officer Grier
Case Number: 1:2010cv01015
Filed: March 4, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER case dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rules, Orders of this Court and failure to prosecute this case. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 16, 2013. (cnn)
September 27, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Case administratively terminated; plaintiff may file to reopen upon release from Arkansas State Hospital. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 27, 2011. (cnn)
March 3, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER case stayed and administratively terminated; Bench trial is cancelled; plaintiff may file a motion to reopen once he is released from AR State Hospital. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 3, 2011. (cnn)
January 5, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION granting and denying in parts 24 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Officer Grier, Ken Jones, Lt. Bass, Jim Sanders, Clark Burton. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 5, 2011. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Donnell Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Grier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?