Christy v. Achievers of Louisiana, Inc.

Plaintiff: Shona Christy
Defendant: Achievers of Louisiana, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv01040
Filed: June 3, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Ashley
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying Counter 28 Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiffs habitability and merchantability claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Plaintiffs workmanship and fitness claims remain. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 20, 2012. (cnn)
December 21, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion to Supplement amd 31 Motion to Continue, as set forth. ( Jury Trial reset for 7/30/2012 9:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Robert T. Dawson.) Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 21, 2011. (lw)
November 9, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 14 ; denying 5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Achievers of Louisiana, Inc. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on November 9, 2010. (cnn)
October 21, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Achievers of Louisiana, Inc should be denied. Objections to R&R due by 11/8/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 21, 2010. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christy v. Achievers of Louisiana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shona Christy
Represented By: Billy J. Hubbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Achievers of Louisiana, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Swearingen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?