Thurman v. Kilgore et al

Plaintiff: Reginald M Thurman
Defendant: Bob Kilgore, Floyd Nutt and Bob Dunn
Case Number: 1:2011cv01041
Filed: June 21, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 27 ; granting 24 Motion to Dismiss; case dismissed against all parties without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 2, 2015. (cnn)
September 23, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; denying 19 Report and Recommendations; case referred back to Magistrate Judge Bryant for further review. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 23, 2014. (cnn)
August 28, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Adopting 15 Report and Recommendations; granting 13 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Claims against Bob Dunn and Floyd Nutt are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 28, 2012. (cnn)
June 21, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER transferring the case to the Western District of Arkansas, El Dorado Division. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/21/11. (kpr) [Transferred from ared on 6/21/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thurman v. Kilgore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald M Thurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd Nutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?